CO HB1292 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the reauthorization of the Colorado resiliency office, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Resiliency Office Reauthorization Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1292 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1292 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1292, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 19-1292 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Governor Signed
2019-05-02SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-24SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-04-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-18HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-17HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-16HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-08HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-03-29HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1292
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1292_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1292_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1292_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1292_rv2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1292_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0b30517ee5e6f88c872583d6006b3cc2-hb19-1292-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e45e27d2874b06d8872583de004d0822-hb19-1292-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e45e27d2874b06d8872583de004d0822-hb19-1292-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1292vote55002c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/462acc4aa76038c5872583e7000ae981-hb19-1292-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/897a0be8cec83184872583e8004def8a-hb19-1292-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1292vote377ab4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1292vote7b9c16

Bill Comments

feedback