CO HB1291 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the "Uniform Collaborative Law Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Collaborative Law Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
2020-03-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2020-03-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-06HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-03-03HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback