CO HB1290 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the referral of a ballot issue related to the underestimation of revenue from the taxes on products that contain nicotine in a required notice to voters, and, in connection therewith, referring a ballot issue to the voters to allow the state to retain and spend state revenues that would otherwise need to be refunded for exceeding the estimate in the ballot information booklet analysis for proposition EE and to allow the state to maintain the tax rates on cigarettes, tobacco products, and nicotine products established in proposition EE that would otherwise need to be decreased.
Title
Proposition EE Funding Retention Rate Reduction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1290 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1290 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1290 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1290 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1290 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1290 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1290 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1290 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2023-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-17 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-04-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |