CO HB1290 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability of an insurer to use a failure-to-cooperate defense in an action in which the insured has made a claim under insurance coverage for an incident.
Title
Failure-to-cooperate Defense First-party Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1290 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.003) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1290, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1290, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1290 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.003) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1290, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1290, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-06-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 06/01/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |