CO HB1290 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the substitution of foreign work experience for the required contact hours by an applicant for examination pursuant to the "Barber and Cosmetologist Act".
Title
Examination Applicant Barber And Cosmetologist Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1290 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1290 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1290 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1290 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2019-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-09 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |