CO HB1286 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changes to monetary penalties for the offense of cruelty to animals for working animals that are used in connection with governmental entities.
Title
Increase Penalty Cruelty Police And Service Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1286 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1286, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1286 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1286, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |