CO HB1285 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning preventing bullying in public schools based on student physical appearance.
Title
Student Weight-Based Bullying Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1285 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1285 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 24-1285 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1285 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2024-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |