CO HB1285 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law Enforcement Use Of Body-worn Cameras

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Enforcement Use Of Body-worn Cameras

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1285 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - reconsider The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1285 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1285 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1285 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1285, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to L.002, page 1, line 5, strike ""fourteen"." and substitute ""fifteen"." (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to the bill, page 7, line 5, strike "Recommend" and substitute "Consider" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to amendment L.002, page 1, line 5, strike ""fourteen"." and substitute ""fifteen"."; after line 5, insert "Page 5, line 20, strike "but not" and substitute "and"." (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to L.002, page 1, line 5, strike ""fourteen"." and substitute ""fifteen"." (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-20HouseGovernor Signed
2015-05-18HouseSent to the Governor
2015-05-18HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-05SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-04SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-04-27SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations
2015-04-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-04-13HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-04-10HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-03-31HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2015-03-17HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8BEA498E90715ED087257DA200621458?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8BEA498E90715ED087257DA200621458/$FILE/1285_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8BEA498E90715ED087257DA200621458/$FILE/1285jud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8BEA498E90715ED087257DA200621458/$FILE/1285app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8BEA498E90715ED087257DA200621458/$FILE/1285_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8BEA498E90715ED087257DA200621458/$FILE/1285_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8BEA498E90715ED087257DA200621458/$FILE/1285_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8BEA498E90715ED087257DA200621458/$FILE/1285_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8BEA498E90715ED087257DA200621458/$FILE/1285_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E5F22FBAD86EDB6287257E19007C5DCF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A6622EA9204453B787257E23004E8FB8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2F00D816C6587BDD87257E23004E9C17
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7A52C53ADB0CD24D87257E340073F92F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F137279049F3860887257E38004ED55B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A7F2778090FB6FB587257E38004EC262
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/569355E2D03CD74287257E3B006C187A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/16CF06F506BBB84087257E3B006C2332
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E5F22FBAD86EDB6287257E19007C5DCF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E2294B3127B30E8387257E1900779EFE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/94C1B4BA76941E3D87257E1900760D37
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8A2AD86B7390BE1787257E19007746DB
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/81A0A1E90C6DC43887257E19007A2A9C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3BD3B3712DCAF1C287257E190079D1A6
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2C6F7FC9CB65682987257E19007A5034
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/09653EA94DD1209187257E1900769F2E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/060D693153A0ED9387257E1900795E78

Bill Comments

feedback