CO HB1285 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Overweight Vehicle Fine Tax Incentives

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Overweight Vehicle Fine Tax Incentives

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1285 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-10 Governor Action - Signed
2010-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2010-06-01 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-05-27 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2010-05-12 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2010-05-11 Senate Third Reading Passed
2010-05-10 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-05-06 Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2010-05-04 Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2010-04-29 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
2010-04-27 House Third Reading Passed
2010-04-26 House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-04-23 House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2010-04-14 House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2010-03-09 House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance
2010-02-05 Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Finance + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23FA0B52BBBC7708872576AA00697F6D?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23FA0B52BBBC7708872576AA00697F6D/$FILE/1285_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23FA0B52BBBC7708872576AA00697F6D/$FILE/1285teFIN.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23FA0B52BBBC7708872576AA00697F6D/$FILE/1285teFINapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23FA0B52BBBC7708872576AA00697F6D/$FILE/1285sapp_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23FA0B52BBBC7708872576AA00697F6D/$FILE/1285_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23FA0B52BBBC7708872576AA00697F6D/$FILE/1285_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23FA0B52BBBC7708872576AA00697F6D/$FILE/1285_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23FA0B52BBBC7708872576AA00697F6D/$FILE/1285_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/23FA0B52BBBC7708872576AA00697F6D/$FILE/1285_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7A490788FB313ACE872576E10079E51E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/040D03F4BD8CB7868725770500721521
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/475E1C5CDA640F5B8725770E004C9328
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/08209451BED72C76872577190080E7D4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E9F08291F5A982B58725771B005056BD

Bill Comments

feedback