CO HB1284 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the limitation on the aggregate amount of fees that may be assessed by governmental bodies for the installation of active solar energy systems, and, in connection therewith, extending the repeal date of the limitation.
Title
Limit Fee Install Active Solar Energy System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1284 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1284 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1284 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1284 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2021-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-07 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-05 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |