CO HB1283 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
concerning insurance policies, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Disclosure Of Insurance Liability Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1283 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1283 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1283, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1283, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1283 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1283 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1283, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1283, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-09 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |