CO HB1283 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a task force to examine workforce resiliency in the child welfare system.
Title
Task Force Child Welfare Worker Resiliency Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1283 to the Committee of the Whole, and a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. Ms. Meyer returned to respond to questions from the committee about the implementation of the bill. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 17-1283 to the Committee of the Whole, and a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. Ms. Meyer returned to respond to questions from the committee about the implementation of the bill. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 17-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2017-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-11 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |