CO HB1282 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning additional consumer protections resulting from the regulation of mortgage servicers, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Add Consumer Protections Regulation Mortgage Servicers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1282 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1282, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1282, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1282, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1282, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1282, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1282, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1282, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1282, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-07 Governor Signed
2021-06-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-24HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-23SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-03SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-06-02SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-01SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-06-01SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-25SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-20SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2021-05-20HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-19HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-18HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-10HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance
2021-04-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1282
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1282_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1282_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1282_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1282_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1282_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1282_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1282_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1282_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1282_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1282_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1282_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1282_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1282_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1282_L.010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1282_L.008.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1282_L.011.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1282_L.012.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1282_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1282_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1282_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1282_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1282_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/aeef4068a02d3521872586c6006bafad-hb21-1282-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/caea44114112f622872586d1006fda10-hb21-1282-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb747c59b2f719a3872586d9004e6f9e-hb21-1282-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb747c59b2f719a3872586d9004e6f9e-hb21-1282-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1282vote57e935
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/aeef4068a02d3521872586c6006bafad-hb21-1282-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/aeef4068a02d3521872586c6006bafad-hb21-1282-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/aeef4068a02d3521872586c6006bafad-hb21-1282-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3ac30448b7333831872586e000782dcd-hb21-1282-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/da6e7d681a9fbbc8872586e7004d9665-hb21-1282-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/caea44114112f622872586d1006fda10-hb21-1282-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/caea44114112f622872586d1006fda10-hb21-1282-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/caea44114112f622872586d1006fda10-hb21-1282-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3ac30448b7333831872586e000782dcd-hb21-1282-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3ac30448b7333831872586e000782dcd-hb21-1282-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1282vote57a696
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1282vote5856bb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1282vote58724d

Bill Comments 750

feedback