CO HB1282 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement that a health care provider include certain identifying information on all claims for reimbursement for health care services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Provider Unique Identification Per Site Or Service

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment Q). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment R). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1282, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1282 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25 Governor Signed
2018-04-19 Sent to the Governor
2018-04-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-04-09SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2018-04-05SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 04/09/2018
2018-04-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-03-26SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2018-03-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-23HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-03-19HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/23/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-15HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-03-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1282
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1282_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1282_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1282_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1282_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1282_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1282_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hhie2018a2018-03-15t134406z-hb18-1282-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1282vote5ccf82
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/shhs2018a2018-03-29t133328z-hb18-1282-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1282vote5e5f20
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1282vote5c55c8
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1282vote5c6f94
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/shhs2018a2018-03-29t133328z-hb18-1282-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/shhs2018a2018-03-29t133328z-hb18-1282-2-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback