CO HB1282 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Align Regular Biennial School Elections & FCPA

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Align Regular Biennial School Elections & FCPA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1282 to the Committee of the Whole and place on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1282 to the Committee of the Whole and place on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1282 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1282 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment L) to House Bill 16-1282 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment K) to House Bill 16-1282 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1282, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-08HouseGovernor Signed
2016-05-11HouseSent to the Governor
2016-05-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-05-10HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-05-02SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-29SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-29SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-04-25SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2016-04-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2016-04-14HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-12HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-04-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2016-04-07HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-03-21HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2016-02-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4719580D64793387257F24006686A9?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4719580D64793387257F24006686A9/$FILE/1282_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4719580D64793387257F24006686A9/$FILE/1282sa_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4719580D64793387257F24006686A9/$FILE/1282app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4719580D64793387257F24006686A9/$FILE/1282_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4719580D64793387257F24006686A9/$FILE/1282_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4719580D64793387257F24006686A9/$FILE/1282_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4719580D64793387257F24006686A9/$FILE/1282_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4719580D64793387257F24006686A9/$FILE/1282_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/ED4719580D64793387257F24006686A9/$FILE/1282_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/293306ED3D17852087257F7E001152EF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C0B5C74261AB864787257F7E0011201C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/139479953A3450AF87257F7E001134B2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/6AB377213BECB5D187257F9500545AAF/$FILE/Ap14.pdf#819
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/693809A3999B127D87257FA0007F6E57
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C9C6E5A9F83BBE7A87257FA4004E5E87
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/D98354E468EB4F5987257FA70050AB0F/$FILE/jour_111.pdf#978
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/693809A3999B127D87257FA0007F6E57
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C9C6E5A9F83BBE7A87257FA4004E5E87

Bill Comments

feedback