CO HB1282 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State Geological Survey Review Of Subdivision Plan

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Geological Survey Review Of Subdivision Plan

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1282 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1282 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1282 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1282 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-11 Governor Action - Signed
2012-05-08 Sent to the Governor
2012-04-30 Senate Third Reading Passed
2012-04-27 Senate Second Reading Passed
2012-04-26 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-04-24 Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2012-04-10 Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2012-03-30 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2012-03-28 House Third Reading Passed
2012-03-27 House Second Reading Passed
2012-03-23 House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2012-03-12 House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2012-02-07 Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/538F674C8ADD08DD87257981007F3B16?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/538F674C8ADD08DD87257981007F3B16/$FILE/1282_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/538F674C8ADD08DD87257981007F3B16/$FILE/1282_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/538F674C8ADD08DD87257981007F3B16/$FILE/1282_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/538F674C8ADD08DD87257981007F3B16/$FILE/1282_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/538F674C8ADD08DD87257981007F3B16/$FILE/1282_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/538F674C8ADD08DD87257981007F3B16/$FILE/1282_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4D55D6856C5362B8872579BF006D593D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FD63D3D15B162DEB872579CA00524B97
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F4FC7D0C3273D312872579DC006ECADB
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E22B0F8F4B9C4FF8872579EA004D616D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4D55D6856C5362B8872579BF006D593D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/FD63D3D15B162DEB872579CA00524B97
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F4FC7D0C3273D312872579DC006ECADB
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E22B0F8F4B9C4FF8872579EA004D616D

Bill Comments

feedback