CO HB1281 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the community behavioral health disaster preparedness and response program in the department of public health and environment to ensure behavioral health is adequately represented within disaster preparedness and response efforts across the state, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Behavioral Health Disaster Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1281 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1281 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1281, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1281, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1281, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1281, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1281, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-03SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-03SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-25SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-20SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2021-05-20HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-19HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-18HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1281
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1281_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1281_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1281_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1281_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1281_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1281_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1281_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1281_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1281_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1281_L.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1281_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1281_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1281_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f493317ede31cfb3872586c7006220c6-house-bill-21-1281-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f493317ede31cfb3872586c7006220c6-hb21-1281-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7060dee66d892780872586d9004e3ab4-hb21-1281-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7060dee66d892780872586d9004e3ab4-hb21-1281-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1281vote55765a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f493317ede31cfb3872586c7006220c6-hb21-1281-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f493317ede31cfb3872586c7006220c6-hb21-1281-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4513e085aeb13d24872586e1001a9000-hb21-1281-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f036b1c799b21173872586e9004f92e3-hb21-1281-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1281vote5bb798

Bill Comments 750

feedback