CO HB1281 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hlth Care Professional Loan Forgiveness
Title
Hlth Care Professional Loan Forgiveness
Sponsors
Sen. Betty Boyd [D] | Rep. Janak Joshi [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1281 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1281 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1281 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1281, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1281, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1281, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1281 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1281 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1281 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW with amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1281, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1281, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1281, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-21 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-04-14 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Appropriations | |
2011-04-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-08 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-22 | House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-09 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment + Appropriations |