CO HB1280 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the college kickstarter account program to incentivize the creation of a college savings account for every child born in Colorado.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child College Savings Accounts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1280 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1280 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1280, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1280, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Governor Signed
2019-05-09 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2019-04-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-15HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-12HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-08HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-27HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1280
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1280_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1280_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1280_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1280_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1280_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1280_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3ffec6eba87cad69872583d6006b4925-hb19-1280-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/17071b429052818c872583da004d4dfb-hb19-1280-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/17071b429052818c872583da004d4dfb-hb19-1280-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3ffec6eba87cad69872583d6006b4925-hb19-1280-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3ffec6eba87cad69872583d6006b4925-hb19-1280-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1280vote554ac1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/95d4b2626d80d65c872583e80003b9ff-hb19-1280-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/15ae3b3c59fb4016872583e900097d02-hb19-1280-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1280vote0203f0

Bill Comments

feedback