CO HB1279 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the ability of a licensed retail marijuana store to sell retail marijuana to a person who is not physically present on the store's licensed premises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow Retail Marijuana Online Sales

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1279 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1279, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01 Governor Signed
2023-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-05-12HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-05-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2023-04-15HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-14HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2023-04-13HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-03-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb23-1279
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1279_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1279_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1279_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1279_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1279_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_1279_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/8D36C8A895B324E7872589900055FA75/HB1279_L.002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1279_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1279_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_hb1279_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c60f49a3efc69ff87258990005898dd-hb23-1279-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1279vote4e9bcb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/269199819b3ae37e8725899c007d73fe-hb23-1279-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb23-1279vote779251
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c60f49a3efc69ff87258990005898dd-hb23-1279-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback