CO HB1279 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the codification of a person's fundamental right to make reproductive health-care decisions free from government interference.
Title
Reproductive Health Equity Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.006) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.005) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1279 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 22 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.066) (Y: 20 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.065) (Y: 20 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.058) (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.054) (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.051) (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.050) (Y: 24 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.049) (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.048) (Y: 22 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.047) (Y: 22 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.046) (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.026) (Y: 20 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1279 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.006) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.005) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1279 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 22 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.066) (Y: 20 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.065) (Y: 20 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.058) (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.054) (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.051) (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.050) (Y: 24 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.049) (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.048) (Y: 22 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.047) (Y: 22 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.046) (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-12 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.026) (Y: 20 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 22-1279 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Governor Signed | |
2022-03-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-03-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |