CO HB1277 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the filing of income tax returns by business entities.
Title
Reporting Adjustments To Taxable Income
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1277 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1277 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1277 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1277 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1277 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1277 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1277 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1277 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2023-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-10 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-03-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |