CO HB1277 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning definitions for reimbursement of final disposition expenses of eligible assistance recipients.
Title
Eligible Recipients For Final Disposition Expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1277 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1277 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1277 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1277 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-05-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-06 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |