CO HB1276 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the prevention of substance use disorders, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Prevention Of Substance Use Disorders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.025) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1276, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.023 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1276, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.021 (Attachment E). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1276, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1276, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1276, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment K). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment J). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment G). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment H). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1276, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.025) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1276, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.023 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1276, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.021 (Attachment E). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1276, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1276, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1276, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment K). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment J). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment G). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment H). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 21-1276, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-05-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-05 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-04-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |