CO HB1276 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning teaching civil government in public schools, and, in connection therewith, establishing the history, culture, and civil government in education commission to make recommendations to include the history, culture, and contributions of American Indians, Hispanic Americans, African Americans, and Asian Americans in the teaching and content standards for history and civics, and making an appropriation.
Title
Teaching Competent History In Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1276 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1276 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.004) (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.003) (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1276, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1276, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1276, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1276 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.004) (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 34 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.003) (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1276, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1276, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1276, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/26/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-19 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-03-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |