CO HB1274 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Out-of-home Juvenile Transition Pub Sch
Title
Out-of-home Juvenile Transition Pub Sch
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-12 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered | |
2010-05-11 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-10 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Committee on Education Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-03-26 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education | |
2010-03-23 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-22 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-19 | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-16 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/19/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-08 | House Committee on Education Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-02-05 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |