CO HB1273 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requiring the department of education to prepare an annual report relating to the total number of school psychologists licensed and employed by a school district, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Colorado Department Of Education Report Concerning School Psychologists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1273 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1273 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1273, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1273 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1273 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1273 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1273, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1273 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2021-05-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-22 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |