CO HB1273 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning protection for Colorado residents from federal government overreach based on a person's status.
Title
Protect Colorado Residents From Federal Government Overreach
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1273 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1273 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.002) (Y: 37 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1273, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1273, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1273 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.002) (Y: 37 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1273, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1273, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/18/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |