CO HB1273 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that an applicant for a real estate development permit demonstrate water conservation measures that will be implemented in the development.
Title
Real Estate Development Demonstrate Water Conservation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1273 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1273 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1273, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1273, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1273 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1273, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1273, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |