CO HB1271 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the establishment of programs offering state assistance to local governments to promote the development of innovative affordable housing strategies in a manner that is compatible with best local land use practices, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department Of Local Affairs Innovative Affordable Housing Strategies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1271, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1271, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1271, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1271, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.004 (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1271, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt Amendment L.004 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt Amendment L.001 (Attachment B). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1271, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-27 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-08SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-07SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-04SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-06-03SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-11SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2021-05-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-04HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-28HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1271
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1271_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1271_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1271_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1271_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1271_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1271_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1271_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1271_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1271_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1271_J.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1271_J.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1271_J.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1271_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1271_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1271_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1271_L.008.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1271_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1271_L.010.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1271_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1271_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1271_r2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/da04e964389952b6872586c5006be5ae-hb21-1271-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1278aa80c68c83e9872586cb00519b52-hb21-1271-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1278aa80c68c83e9872586cb00519b52-hb21-1271-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1278aa80c68c83e9872586cb00519b52-hb21-1271-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1278aa80c68c83e9872586cb00519b52-hb21-1271-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1278aa80c68c83e9872586cb00519b52-hb21-1271-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1271vote561c5d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/92e4578878bc9d2e872586d20074ef16-hb21-1271-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/da04e964389952b6872586c5006be5ae-hb21-1271-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/da04e964389952b6872586c5006be5ae-hb21-1271-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/da04e964389952b6872586c5006be5ae-hb21-1271-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8efadf1d02fc2d39872586ea0002892b-hb21-1271-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8efadf1d02fc2d39872586ea0002892b-hb21-1271-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/92e4578878bc9d2e872586d20074ef16-hb21-1271-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1271vote623d4c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1271vote5f3c9d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1271vote5f5118

Bill Comments 750

feedback