CO HB1271 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a clarification of the authority of the Colorado water conservation board to augment stream flows with acquired water rights that have been previously decreed for augmentation use.
Title
Augmention Of Instream Flows
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Postpone House Bill 19-1271 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment C]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Adopt amendment L.003 [Attachment D]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1271, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1271, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment C]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Adopt amendment L.003 [Attachment D]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1271, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1271, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2019-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |