CO HB1270 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the urgent incident response fund for the purpose of reimbursing certain governmental entities for the costs of responding to urgent incidents, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Creation Of Urgent Incident Response Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1270 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 23-1270 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.006) (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 23-1270 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1270 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 23-1270 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.006) (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 23-1270 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2023-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-10 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-03-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |