CO HB1270 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcohol Retail Purchase By On-premises Licensee
Title
Alcohol Retail Purchase By On-premises Licensee
Sponsors
Sen. Stratton Heath [D] | Rep. Su Ryden [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-08 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-03-27 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Lay Over Daily | |
2012-03-23 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology | |
2012-02-21 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-20 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-17 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-14 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development |