CO HB1269 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an investigation by the public utilities commission to evaluate the parameters of an energy policy allowing communities in Colorado that are served by an investor-owned electric utility to choose alternative wholesale electricity suppliers, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities Commission Study Of Community Choice Energy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.004) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1269 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 21-1269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 21-1269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1269, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1269, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25 Governor Signed
2021-06-23 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-23HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-08SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-04SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-06-02SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-01SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-06-01SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-25SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2021-05-22HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-21HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-20HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-18HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-14HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment + Appropriations

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1269
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1269_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1269_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1269_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1269_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1269_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1269_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.022.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.017.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.016.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.008.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.015.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.012.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.019.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.009.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.013.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1269_L.007.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1269_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1269_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1269_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1269_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6c16551c266581c8872586c6006d0539-hb21-1269-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cfab30d9aefd6766872586d5004f75c0-hb21-1269-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6c16551c266581c8872586c6006d0539-hb21-1269-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cfab30d9aefd6766872586d5004f75c0-hb21-1269-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1269vote5c34aa
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bb5aafb9c6bcf6b7872586e1001a62be-hb21-1269-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3f67bca4ec022e30872586e7004d7307-hb21-1269-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1269vote6f2824
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1269vote6f5114
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1269vote6f8164
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1269vote6fabb6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1269vote5789f1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bb5aafb9c6bcf6b7872586e1001a62be-hb21-1269-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1269vote581c5e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1269vote583065

Bill Comments

feedback