CO HB1269 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to improve behavioral health care coverage practices, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Parity Insurance Medicaid

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1269, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1269 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1269, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001, as amended (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Governor Signed
2019-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-29SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-27SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-26SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-24SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-24SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-04-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-16HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-05HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-25HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1269
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1269_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1269_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1269_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1269_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1269_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1269_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6b3971d1db7fc26e872583d30068435f-hb19-1269-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b6fe60c2129ae1ef872583de004cb64f-hb19-1269-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b6fe60c2129ae1ef872583de004cb64f-hb19-1269-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b6fe60c2129ae1ef872583de004cb64f-hb19-1269-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1269vote567d0b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a5483233cb93ff76872583e1005c78f0-hb19-1269-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6b3971d1db7fc26e872583d30068435f-hb19-1269-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6b3971d1db7fc26e872583d30068435f-hb19-1269-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6b3971d1db7fc26e872583d30068435f-hb19-1269-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ebda26ef2dba076f872583e6004bdb4a-hb19-1269-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ebda26ef2dba076f872583e6004bdb4a-hb19-1269-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1269vote566b37
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1269vote145ae9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1269vote144a4e

Bill Comments

feedback