CO HB1269 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning notification to parents of charges brought against public school employees for alleged felony offenses that would result in the revocation of an educator license pursuant to title 22, Colorado Revised Statutes.
Title
Parent Notice For Student Safety And Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1269 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1269, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1269, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1269 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1269, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1269, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-29 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2018-03-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |