CO HB1269 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - House Second Reading Lost with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - House Second Reading Lost with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workplace Fairness Civil Remedies Act
Title
Workplace Fairness Civil Remedies Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | House Second Reading Lost with Amendments | |
2010-04-13 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/15/2010 | |
2010-04-09 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-01 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-02-05 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |