CO HB1266 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the voting rights of persons serving a sentence of parole, and in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restore Voting Rights Parolees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1266 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1266 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1266, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1266, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28 Governor Signed
2019-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-17SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-04-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-09HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-02HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1266
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1266_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1266_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1266_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1266_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1266_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1266_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fd4096dbed5a5abb872583d10009f1fe-hb19-1266-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d8768b18bd27bc94872583d7004e73be-hb19-1266-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d8768b18bd27bc94872583d7004e73be-hb19-1266-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1266vote55f2b0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fd4096dbed5a5abb872583d10009f1fe-hb19-1266-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fdc59aa59bb2d340872583df006cd72e-hb19-1266-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0ccb7c6aab4547b6872583e5004c6948-hb19-1266-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1266vote637be5

Bill Comments 750

feedback