CO HB1266 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning expanding the career development success pilot program.
Title
Career Development Success Program Expansion
Sponsors
Rep. Daneya Esgar [D] | Rep. James Wilson [R] | Sen. Owen Hill [R] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1266 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 18-1266 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1266 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1266 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1266 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 18-1266 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1266 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1266 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2018-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-19 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |