CO HB1266 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Continue Bail Bond Agent Regulation
Title
Sunset Continue Bail Bond Agent Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.020 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.019 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.020 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.019 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1266 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1266 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 005, as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1266, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 005, as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1266, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.019 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.020 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.019 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1266 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1266 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 005, as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1266, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 005, as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1266, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-09 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Second Reading Special Orders - Passed with Amendments | |
2012-05-07 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-30 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance | |
2012-04-25 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2012-04-24 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-23 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-19 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-17 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-28 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-02-17 | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |