CO HB1265 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an increase in the total employer contribution for employers in the judicial division of the public employees' retirement association.
Title
PERA Public Employees' Retirement Association Judicial Division Total Employer Contribution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1265 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1265 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1265 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1265 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1265 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1265 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1265 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1265 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2017-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |