CO HB1263 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reduce Barriers To Employment Criminal Records
Title
Reduce Barriers To Employment Criminal Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.005 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.005 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.005 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1263, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-09 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2012-03-20 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2012-03-20 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-19 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-13 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-08 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-07 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Lay Over Amended | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |