CO HB1261 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Retail Marijuana Sunset
Title
Retail Marijuana Sunset
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Pabon [D] | Sen. Cheri Jahn [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment to amend L.038, line 7 after "REQUIRED" insert "TO" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.038, as amended (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment to amend L.038, line 7 after "REQUIRED" insert "TO" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.038, as amended (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 21 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.015 (Attachment O) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment T). After discussion, this amendment was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt substitute amendment L.027 (Attachment M) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.022 (Attachment R) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment Q) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment P) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment S) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.006 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Amendment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment to amend L.038, line 7 after "REQUIRED" insert "TO" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.038, as amended (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment to amend L.038, line 7 after "REQUIRED" insert "TO" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.038, as amended (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 21 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.015 (Attachment O) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment T). After discussion, this amendment was withdrawn. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt substitute amendment L.027 (Attachment M) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.022 (Attachment R) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment Q) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment P) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment S) (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.006 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Amendment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1261, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2016-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-04-15 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |