CO HB1260 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-8)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-8)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ensuring students have reasonable access to medically necessary services in schools.
Title
Access To Medically Necessary Services For Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1260 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 22-1260 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1260 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 22-1260 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2022-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-21 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |