CO HB1259 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-14)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the process for funding local education providers for extended learning opportunities to address disrupted learning.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extended Learning Opportunities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1259 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.003) (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1259, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1259, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Governor Signed
2021-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-27HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-05-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-06SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-28SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2021-04-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-26HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-21HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-06HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1259
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1259_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1259_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1259_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1259_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1259_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1259_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1259_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1259_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1259_L.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1259_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1259_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6d2a082f66643644872586be005c27cc-hb21-1259-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1259vote5432f1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1259vote544a18
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1259vote54140f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6d2a082f66643644872586be005c27cc-hb21-1259-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c259d4b6777d6af7872586cd0070c4fd-hb21-1259-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1259vote54f3ef

Bill Comments

feedback