CO HB1259 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that an independent expenditure committee created by a candidate for public office is subject to constitutional requirements governing limits on contributions to such candidates.
Title
Independent Expenditure Committees And Candidates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1259 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1259 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1259 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1259, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1259, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1259 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1259 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1259, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1259, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-20 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |