CO HB1258 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the allocation of money that the state keeps and spends as a result of a voter-approved revenue change at the 2019 statewide election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allocate Voter-approved Revenue For Education & Transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1258 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1258 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03 Governor Signed
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2019-04-16HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-15HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-12HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-09HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-01HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1258
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1258_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1258_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1258_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1258_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1258_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1258_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f2a4c3e8540496c7872583cf007996bd-hb19-1258-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9dd8647304496783872583d7004e4435-hb19-1258-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f2a4c3e8540496c7872583cf007996bd-hb19-1258-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f2a4c3e8540496c7872583cf007996bd-hb19-1258-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1258vote5b02f8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fc2659b6e486459e872583e6000bbd21-hb19-1258-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1258vote79f5cb

Bill Comments

feedback