CO HB1258 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning authorization for an endorsement to an existing marijuana license to allow for a marijuana accessory consumption establishment for the purposes of consumer education, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana Accessory Consumption Establishments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1258, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.020 [Attachment D]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.016) (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1258, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 [Attachment G]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - House Finance: Adopt severed section B of amendment L.002 (Page 1, lines 3 and 4) [see Attachment D]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - House Finance: Adopt severed section B of amendment L.006 (Page 1, lines 8 through 15) [see Attachment H]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - House Finance: Adopt severed section B of amendment L.001 (Page 4, lines 26 through 37 and Page 5) [see Attachment C]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Finance: Adopt severed section B of amendment L.003 (Page 1, lines 4 and 5) [see Attachment E]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - House Finance: Adopt severed section B of amendment L.004 (Page 1, lines 7 through 10) [see Attachment F]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04 Governor Vetoed
2018-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-03SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2018-04-27SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2018-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2018-04-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2018-04-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2018-04-10HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2018-04-09HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2018 - No Amendments
2018-04-06HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/09/2018 - No Amendments
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-03-19HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2018-02-26HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1258
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1258_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1258_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1258_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1258_rv2.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1258_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1258_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-03-19t133728z-hb18-1258-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-03-19t133728z-hb18-1258-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-03-19t133728z-hb18-1258-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-03-19t133728z-hb18-1258-7-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-03-19t133728z-hb18-1258-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-03-19t133728z-hb18-1258-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-03-19t133728z-hb18-1258-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2018a2018-03-19t133728z-hb18-1258-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-06t080503z-hb18-1258-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-04-06t080503z-hb18-1258-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1258vote589c86
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1258vote58e27d
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1258vote58ca2c
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-04-17t140129z-hb18-1258-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-04-17t140129z-hb18-1258-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sfin2018a2018-04-17t140129z-hb18-1258-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-04-24t083629z-hb18-1258-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-04-24t083629z-hb18-1258-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1258vote5b9ae4
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1258vote5d1440
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1258vote5d2e5e

Bill Comments 750

feedback