CO HB1258 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Community And Law Enforcement Trust Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community And Law Enforcement Trust Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1258 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1258 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1258 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1258 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-26HouseGovernor Action - Signed
2013-04-19HouseSent to the Governor
2013-04-08SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-04-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed
2013-04-04SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-04-01SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-03-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2013-03-25HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-03-22HouseHouse Second Reading Passed
2013-03-20HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-03-18HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-03-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CCB0348136D717C387257AEE00584327?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CCB0348136D717C387257AEE00584327/$FILE/1258_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CCB0348136D717C387257AEE00584327/$FILE/1258_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CCB0348136D717C387257AEE00584327/$FILE/1258_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CCB0348136D717C387257AEE00584327/$FILE/1258_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CCB0348136D717C387257AEE00584327/$FILE/1258_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/CCB0348136D717C387257AEE00584327/$FILE/1258_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/90B04E17397208A587257B320075DC72
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3D010C8990D09ED387257B410009422B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/90B04E17397208A587257B320075DC72
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/3D010C8990D09ED387257B410009422B

Bill Comments

feedback