CO HB1255 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - House Third Reading Lost with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - House Third Reading Lost with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Colorado Alternative Energy Park Act
Title
Colorado Alternative Energy Park Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | House Third Reading Lost with Amendments | |
2011-04-20 | House Second Reading Lost with Amendments | |
2011-04-19 | House Second Reading Laid Over with Amendments | |
2011-04-11 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-06 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-31 | House Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-02-11 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |